Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovan Battista Renzoli

Deceased

Bishop of Amelia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1658BornVetralla
18 Jul 168325.0Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jul 172163.0AppointedBishop of Amelia, Italy
20 Jul 172163.0Ordained BishopBishop of Amelia, Italy
Sep 174385.1DiedBishop of Amelia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovan Battista Renzoli:
Bishop Giovan Battista Renzoli (born ) Bishop of Amelia

  • a priest for 60.1 years
  • a bishop for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 81

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013