Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Werner von Veyder

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}

Titular Bishop of Eleutheropolis in Macedonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1657³BornNeufchateau
8 Sep 169436.7Ordained PriestPriest
12 Nov 170345.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
12 Nov 170345.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Eleutheropolis in Macedonia
2 Mar 170446.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eleutheropolis in Macedonia
30 Oct 172365.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johannes Werner von Veyder:
Bishop Johannes Werner von Veyder (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}

  • a priest for 29.1 years
  • a bishop for 19.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 193
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1704, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 23 Jun 2015