Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Henry Colton

Deceased

Bishop of Buffalo, New York, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1848Born
10 Jun 187627.6Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
20 May 190354.5AppointedBishop of Buffalo, New York, USA
24 Aug 190354.8Ordained BishopBishop of Buffalo, New York, USA
9 May 191566.5DiedBishop of Buffalo, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Charles Henry Colton
Bishop Charles Henry Colton (born , died ) Bishop of Buffalo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew York

  • a priest for 38.9 years
  • a bishop for 11.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 162
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1903, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018