Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe D’Avack

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Camerino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 May 1899Born
29 Jun 192324.0Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
18 Feb 194646.7AppointedArchbishop of Camerino, Italy
10 Mar 194646.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Camerino, Italy
13 Feb 196464.7ResignedArchbishop of Camerino, Italy
13 Feb 196464.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Leontopolis in Pamphylia
19 Sep 197273.3ResignedTitular Archbishop of Leontopolis in Pamphylia
24 Jul 197980.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Camerino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe D’Avack
Archbishop Giuseppe D’Avack (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Camerino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 56.0 years
  • a bishop for 33.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast