Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Donald Walter Trautman

Bishop Emeritus of Erie, Pennsylvania, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1936 Born
7 Apr 196225.7Ordained PriestPriest of Buffalo, New York, USA
27 Feb 198548.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buffalo, New York, USA
27 Feb 198548.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Sassura
16 Apr 198548.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sassura
2 Jun 199053.9AppointedBishop of Erie, Pennsylvania, USA
16 Jul 199054.0InstalledBishop of Erie, Pennsylvania, USA
31 Jul 201276.1RetiredBishop of Erie, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Donald Walter Trautman
Bishop Donald Walter Trautman (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Erie

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuffalo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Erie.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 31 Jul 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast