Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Owen John Dolan

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop Emeritus of Palmerston North, New Zealand


Motto: Seek The Mind Of Christ


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1928Born
21 Jul 195425.8Ordained PriestPriest of Wellington, New Zealand
6 Mar 198051.4IncardinatedPriest of Palmerston North, New Zealand
2 Nov 199567.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Palmerston North, New Zealand
10 Dec 199567.1Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Palmerston North, New Zealand
30 Sep 200476.0RetiredCoadjutor Bishop of Palmerston North, New Zealand
28 Apr 202596.5DiedCoadjutor Bishop Emeritus of Palmerston North, New Zealand

MicroData Summary
Owen John Dolan
Bishop Owen John Dolan
(born , died )
Coadjutor Bishop Emeritus of Palmerston North

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHāwera, Archdiocese of Wellington
Ordained PriestHāwera, Archdiocese of Wellington
Ordained BishopHoly Spirit, Cathedral, Palmerston North, Diocese of Palmerston North
Death PlaceHospital, Palmerston North, Diocese of Palmerston North

  • a priest for 70.7 years
  • a bishop for 29.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • c1: AustOceaniaBishops.org
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144, Number 12,672
  • d: CB, 28 Apr 2025

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025