Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Reginald John Cardinal Delargey

Deceased

Archbishop of Wellington

Cardinal-Priest of Immacolata al Tiburtino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1914BornTimaru
19 Mar 193823.3Ordained PriestPriest of Auckland, New Zealand
25 Nov 195743.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Auckland, New Zealand
25 Nov 195743.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Hirina
27 Feb 195843.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hirina
1 Sep 197055.7AppointedBishop of Auckland, New Zealand
25 Apr 197459.4AppointedArchbishop of Wellington, New Zealand
24 May 197661.5Elevated to Cardinal
24 May 197661.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Immacolata al Tiburtino
29 Jan 197964.1DiedArchbishop of Wellington, New Zealand

MicroData Summary for Reginald John Delargey:
Cardinal Reginald John Delargey (born , died ) Archbishop of Wellington

  • a priest for 40.9 years
  • a bishop for 20.9 years
  • a cardinal for 2.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013