Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stephen Marmion Lowe

Bishop of Hamilton in New Zealand


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1962 Born
7 Jun 199633.8Ordained PriestPriest of Christchurch, New Zealand
22 Nov 201452.3AppointedBishop of Hamilton in New Zealand
13 Feb 201552.5Ordained BishopBishop of Hamilton in New Zealand

MicroData Summary for Stephen Marmion Lowe
Bishop Stephen Marmion Lowe (born ) Bishop of Hamilton in New Zealand

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHokitika

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Hamilton in New Zealand.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Nov 2014
  • c2+: CB, 11 Jan 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Number 18,367

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast