Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Spiridion Poloméni

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Carthage

Titular Bishop of Ruspae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1844BornZante, Greece
26 Feb 189247.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Ruspae
27 Feb 189247.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Carthage, Tunisia
5 Jun 189248.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ruspae
12 Sep 193086.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Carthage, Tunisia

MicroData Summary for Spiridion Poloméni:
Bishop Spiridion Poloméni (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Carthage

  • a bishop for 38.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 489

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013