Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomeo Casati

Deceased

Bishop of Cremona, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1791Born
4 Jun 181423.1Ordained PriestPriest
16 Feb 183947.8SelectedBishop of Cremona, Italy
8 Jul 183948.2ConfirmedBishop of Cremona, Italy
14 Jul 183948.2Ordained BishopBishop of Cremona, Italy
18 Sep 184453.4DiedBishop of Cremona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo Casati
Bishop Bartolomeo Casati (born , died ) Bishop of Cremona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGravedona
Ordained BishopS. Charles au Corso, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 30.2 years
  • a bishop for 5.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 167
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1839, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast