Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Koenraad Vanhoutte

Auxiliary Bishop of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}, Belgium

Titular Bishop of Thagora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1957 Born
17 Jul 198325.8Ordained PriestPriest of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
23 Apr 2010³52.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
10 Jul 201052.8CeasedApostolic Administrator of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
6 Nov 2015³58.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
4 Dec 201659.2CeasedApostolic Administrator of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
18 May 201860.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}, Belgium
18 May 201860.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Thagora
2 Sep 201861.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thagora

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Koenraad Vanhoutte (VIAF: 81100342)
Bishop Koenraad Vanhoutte (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOstende, Diocese of Brugge {Bruges}
Ordained BishopSaint Rombaut, Cathedral, Mechelen, Archdiocese of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 May 2018
  • ob/c2: CB, 18 May 2018
  • c34: CB, 2 Sep 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.0, 30 Aug 2018; Data: 3 Sep 2018

Quantcast