Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Abbon-Pierre-François Bonnel de la Brageresse

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Viviers


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1757BornMende
14 Apr 178124.2Ordained PriestPriest
6 Sep 182568.6SelectedBishop of Viviers, France
19 Dec 182568.9ConfirmedBishop of Viviers, France
19 Feb 182669.1Ordained BishopBishop of Viviers, France
26 Jun 184184.4RetiredBishop of Viviers, France
24 Jun 184487.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Viviers, France

MicroData Summary for Abbon-Pierre-François Bonnel de la Brageresse:
Bishop Abbon-Pierre-François Bonnel de la Brageresse (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Viviers

  • a priest for 63.2 years
  • a bishop for 18.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 398

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013