Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luigi Martinelli

Deceased

Archbishop of Amalfi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Nov 1884Born
29 Dec 190723.1Ordained PriestPriest
13 Mar 193348.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina, Italy
13 Mar 193348.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Tium
25 Mar 193348.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tium
18 Feb 194661.2AppointedArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy
16 Jun 194661.6DiedArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Martinelli
Archbishop Luigi Martinelli (born , died ) Archbishop of Amalfi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLucca

  • a priest for 38.4 years
  • a bishop for 13.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,947
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,933, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast