Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Capecci, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1838Born
22 Dec 186022.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
19 Apr 189759.0AppointedBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
25 Apr 189759.1Ordained BishopBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
16 Jul 191880.3DiedBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Capecci (VIAF: 307359666)
Bishop Giuseppe Capecci O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Alessandria (della Paglia)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastelfidardo
Ordained BishopSt. Augustin, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 57.5 years
  • a bishop for 21.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1919
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 88
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1897, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017