Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adamo Borghini

Deceased

Bishop of San Severino (Marche), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1859Born
1882²22.0Ordained PriestPriest of Ferrara, Italy
13 Jan 190949.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ferrara, Italy
13 Jan 190949.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Carpasia
2 Feb 190949.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Carpasia
4 Jun 191353.4AppointedBishop of San Severino (Marche), Italy
27 Dec 192667.0DiedBishop of San Severino (-Treia), Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Adamo Borghini
Bishop Adamo Borghini (born , died ) Bishop of San Severino (Marche)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGualdo
Ordained BishopFerrara, Archdiocese of Ferrara

  • a priest for 44.9 years
  • a bishop for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1909, Number 7
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 33, Number 1,895

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 18 Apr 2020

Quantcast