Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ernest Bertrand Boland, O.P.

Bishop Emeritus of Multan, Pakistan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1925 Born
1949²23.4EnteredMember of Order of Friars Preachers
9 Jun 195529.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
17 May 196640.8AppointedBishop of Multan, Pakistan
25 Jul 196641.0Ordained BishopBishop of Multan, Pakistan
20 Oct 198459.2ResignedBishop of Multan, Pakistan

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ernest Bertrand Boland
Bishop Ernest Bertrand Boland O.P. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Multan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceProvidence, RI, Diocese of Providence, Rhode Island, USA
Ordained PriestDominican, Church, Washington, DC, Archdiocese of Washington, District of Columbia, USA

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Multan.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c1: CB, 11 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast