Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patras Yusaf

Deceased

Bishop of Multan, Pakistan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jul 1936Born
29 Dec 196529.4Ordained PriestPriest
19 Dec 198145.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Multan, Pakistan
19 Dec 198145.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Sinnuara
19 Feb 198245.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sinnuara
20 Oct 198448.2AppointedBishop of Multan, Pakistan
29 Dec 199862.4DiedBishop of Multan, Pakistan

MicroData Summary for Patras Yusaf
Bishop Patras Yusaf (born , died ) Bishop of Multan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFrancisabad
Ordained BishopMultan, Diocese of Multan

  • a priest for 33.0 years
  • a bishop for 16.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 83, Number 6,847

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast