Catholic-Hierarchy DC

(Layman) Bernard Matthew Kelly

Deceased

Note/Previous Titular See: (renounced the priesthood)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 May 1918Born
3 Jun 194426.0Ordained PriestPriest of Providence, Rhode Island, USA
25 Nov 196345.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Providence, Rhode Island, USA
25 Nov 196345.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Tegea
30 Jan 196445.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tegea
14 Jun 197153.1ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Providence, Rhode Island, USA
14 Jun 197153.1ResignedTitular Bishop of Tegea
5 Dec 200688.5Died

MicroData Summary for Bernard Matthew Kelly
(Layman) Bernard Matthew Kelly (born , died )

EventPlace
Birth PlaceProvidence, Diocese of Providence, Rhode Island, USA
Death PlacePotomac Valley, Hospital, Keyser, Diocese of Providence, Rhode Island, USA

  • a priest for 62.5 years
  • a bishop for 42.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast