Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanisław Salaterski

Auxiliary Bishop of Tarnów

Titular Bishop of Tigillava


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1954 BornLipnica Murowana
31 May 198126.5Ordained PriestPriest of Tarnów, Poland
14 Dec 201359.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tarnów, Poland
14 Dec 201359.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Tigillava
25 Jan 201459.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tigillava

MicroData Summary for Stanisław Salaterski
Bishop Stanisław Salaterski (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Tarnów

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tarnów.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Dec 2013
  • c1: CB, 14 Dec 2013
  • ob/c2: CB, 29 Dec 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,081

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 6 Feb 2016