Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luiz Colussi

Deceased

Bishop of Caçador, Santa Catarina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1931BornBento Gonçalves
1 Dec 195726.4Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jan 197846.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Londrina, Parana, Brazil
3 Jan 197846.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Gor
7 Mar 197846.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gor
28 Mar 198048.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Lins, Sao Paulo, Brazil
11 Oct 198049.2SucceededBishop of Lins, Sao Paulo, Brazil
5 Dec 198352.4AppointedBishop of Caçador, Santa Catarina, Brazil
4 Dec 199665.4DiedBishop of Caçador, Santa Catarina, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Luiz Colussi:
Bishop Luiz Colussi (born , died ) Bishop of Caçador

  • a priest for 39.0 years
  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013