Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Michael Josef von Pidoll de Quitenbach

Deceased

Bishop of Le Mans


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1734³BornTrier, Germany
20 May 175823.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Trier, Germany
23 Dec 175824.1Ordained PriestPriest of Trier, Germany
21 Feb 179459.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany
21 Feb 179459.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Diocletianopolis in Palaestina
19 Mar 179459.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Diocletianopolis in Palaestina
9 May 180267.5SelectedBishop of Le Mans, France
25 May 180267.5ConfirmedBishop of Le Mans, France
23 Nov 181985.0DiedBishop of Le Mans, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Michael Josef von Pidoll de Quitenbach:
Bishop Johann Michael Josef von Pidoll de Quitenbach (born , died ) Bishop of Le Mans

  • a priest for 60.9 years
  • a bishop for 25.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 144
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 197

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013