Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Rémi Bessieux, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Two Guineas {Des Deux Guinées}

Titular Bishop of Callipolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1803BornVélieux, France
13 Jun 182925.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
20 Jun 184844.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Two Guineas and Senegambia {Guinea Superiore e Inferiore e di Sierra Leone}, Gabon
20 Jun 184844.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Callipolis
14 Jan 184945.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Callipolis
6 Feb 186359.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Two Guineas {Des Deux Guinées}, Gabon
30 Apr 187672.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Two Guineas {Des Deux Guinées}, Gabon

MicroData Summary for Jean-Rémi Bessieux (VIAF: 69245046)
Bishop Jean-Rémi Bessieux C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Two Guineas {Des Deux Guinées}

  • a priest for 46.8 years
  • a bishop for 27.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 173
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1849, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 13 Dec 2016