Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Luíz Bertanha, S.V.D.

Bishop Emeritus of Registro, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1942 Born
18 Dec 197129.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
26 May 199855.7AppointedBishop of Registro, Sao Paulo, Brazil
26 Jul 199855.9Ordained BishopBishop of Registro, Sao Paulo, Brazil
16 May 201875.7RetiredBishop of Registro, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Luíz Bertanha
Bishop José Luíz Bertanha S.V.D. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Registro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCordeirópolis
Ordained BishopSão Francisco Xavier, Cathedral, Registro, Diocese of Registro, Sao Paulo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Registro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,361
  • r: Bollettino, 16 May 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 16 May 2018

Quantcast