Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Olívio Aurélio Fazza, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Foz do Iguaçu, Parana, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1925Born
5 Mar 195529.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
5 May 197852.8AppointedBishop of Foz do Iguaçu, Parana, Brazil
12 Aug 197853.1Ordained BishopBishop of Foz do Iguaçu, Parana, Brazil
28 Nov 200176.4RetiredBishop of Foz do Iguaçu, Parana, Brazil
25 Dec 200883.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Foz do Iguaçu, Parana, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Olívio Aurélio Fazza
Bishop Olívio Aurélio Fazza S.V.D. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Foz do Iguaçu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJuiz de Fora

  • a priest for 53.8 years
  • a bishop for 30.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018