Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomás Ratto Ottonelli

Deceased

Bishop of Córdoba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1688²BornValencia
9 Nov 173143.9AppointedBishop of Córdoba, Spain
9 Dec 173143.9Ordained BishopBishop of Córdoba, Spain
17 Feb 173850.1DiedBishop of Córdoba, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tomás Ratto Ottonelli:
Bishop Tomás Ratto Ottonelli (died ) Bishop of Córdoba

  • a bishop for 6.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 50, Number 210

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 22 Oct 2013