Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillaume-Louis du Tillet

Deceased

Bishop of Orange, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1730Born
24 May 177444.3SelectedBishop of Orange, France
27 Jun 177444.4ConfirmedBishop of Orange, France
17 Jul 177444.4Ordained BishopBishop of Orange, France
22 Dec 179464.9DiedBishop of Orange, France

MicroData Summary for Guillaume-Louis du Tillet
Bishop Guillaume-Louis du Tillet (born , died ) Bishop of Orange

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontramé

  • a bishop for 20.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 107
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1774, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 15 Oct 2018

Quantcast