Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste Marie Scipion Ruffo (Roux) de Bonneval

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Senez


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1747BornAix
26 Oct 178740.7SelectedBishop of Senez, France
15 Dec 178841.8ConfirmedBishop of Senez, France
22 Feb 178942.0Ordained BishopBishop of Senez, France
11 Nov 180154.8ResignedBishop of Senez, France
21 Aug 181770.5SelectedBishop of Avignon, France
13 Mar 183790.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Senez, France

Note(s): ⁶ Before ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste Marie Scipion Ruffo (Roux) de Bonneval (VIAF: 316391020)
Bishop Jean-Baptiste Marie Scipion Ruffo (Roux) de Bonneval (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Senez

  • a bishop for 48.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1789, Number 9
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 375

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016