Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Batakian, I.C.P.B.

Eparch Emeritus of Our Lady of Nareg in New York (Armenian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Nov 1929 BornAthenai
8 Dec 195425.1Ordained PriestPriest of Institut du Clergé Patriarcal de Bzommar
11 Nov 199465.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cilicia (Armenian), Lebanon
11 Nov 199465.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Caesarea in Cappadocia degli Armeni
12 Mar 199565.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caesarea in Cappadocia degli Armeni
30 Nov 200071.1AppointedApostolic Exarch of United States of America and Canada (Armenian), New York
12 Sep 200575.9AppointedEparch of Our Lady of Nareg in New York (Armenian), USA
21 May 201181.5RetiredEparch of Our Lady of Nareg in New York (Armenian), USA

MicroData Summary for Manuel Batakian:
Bishop Manuel Batakian I.C.P.B. (born ) Eparch Emeritus of Our Lady of Nareg in New York

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Our Lady of Nareg in New York (Armenian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Sep 2005
  • r: Bollettino, 21 May 2011
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Number 12,494
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013