Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pietro Kedigian

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Colonia in Armenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1890Born
8 Jun 191323.4Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jul 193646.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Colonia in Armenia
15 Nov 193646.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Colonia in Armenia
17 Sep 195767.6DiedTitular Archbishop of Colonia in Armenia

MicroData Summary for Pietro Kedigian
Archbishop Pietro Kedigian (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Colonia in Armenia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIstanbul, Turkey

  • a priest for 44.2 years
  • a bishop for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1936, Number 83

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast