Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop MikaŽl Antoine Mouradian, I.C.P.B.

Eparch of Our Lady of Nareg in New York (Armenian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jul 1961 BornBeirut, Lebanon
24 Oct 198726.3Ordained PriestPriest of Institut du Clergť Patriarcal de Bzommar
21 May 201149.9AppointedEparch of Our Lady of Nareg in New York (Armenian), USA
31 Jul 201150.1Ordained BishopEparch of Our Lady of Nareg in New York (Armenian), USA
2 Oct 201150.2InstalledEparch of Our Lady of Nareg in New York (Armenian), USA

MicroData Summary for MikaŽl Antoine Mouradian:
Bishop MikaŽl Antoine Mouradian I.C.P.B. (born ) Eparch of Our Lady of Nareg in New York

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Our Lady of Nareg in New York (Armenian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 May 2011
  • ob/i/c1+: CB, 2 Aug 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207, Number 17,122

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013