Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelus Kujur, S.J.

Bishop of Purnea, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1946 Born
13 Apr 198033.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
20 Jan 200760.5AppointedBishop of Purnea, India
18 Apr 200760.7Ordained BishopBishop of Purnea, India

MicroData Summary for Angelus Kujur
Bishop Angelus Kujur S.J. (born ) Bishop of Purnea

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMundaltoli

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Purnea.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Jan 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,404

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast