Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Miranda Vicente

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain

Titular Bishop of Cidramus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1913Born
12 Mar 193824.2Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jul 195137.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain
21 Jul 195137.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Cidramus
7 Oct 195137.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cidramus
13 Mar 196046.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Miranda Vicente
Bishop Francisco Miranda Vicente (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Toledo

EventPlace
Birth PlacePereña

  • a priest for 22.0 years
  • a bishop for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 107

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast