Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jaime Flores Martin, P.S.O.D. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Barbastro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1906BornMacotera
20 Sep 193024.1Ordained PriestPriest of Salamanca, Spain
22 Feb 196053.5AppointedBishop of Barbastro, Spain
1 May 196053.7Ordained BishopBishop of Barbastro, Spain
30 Apr 197063.7ResignedBishop of Barbastro, Spain
30 Apr 197063.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Rubicon
11 Dec 197064.3ResignedTitular Bishop of Rubicon
15 Sep 197468.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Barbastro, Spain

MicroData Summary for Jaime Flores Martin:
Bishop Jaime Flores Martin P.S.O.D. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Barbastro

  • a priest for 44.0 years
  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013