Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Crescent McKinney

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Grand Rapids, Michigan

Titular Bishop of Leontium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Sep 1928BornGrand Rapids
20 Dec 195325.2Ordained PriestPriest of Grand Rapids, Michigan, USA
24 Jul 196839.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Grand Rapids, Michigan, USA
24 Jul 196839.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Leontium
26 Sep 196840.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Leontium
3 Oct 200173.0ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Grand Rapids, Michigan, USA
9 Jun 201081.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Grand Rapids, Michigan, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Crescent McKinney:
Bishop Joseph Crescent McKinney (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Grand Rapids

  • a priest for 56.4 years
  • a bishop for 41.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015