Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ramón María de Azpeitia y Sáenz de Santamaria

Deceased

Bishop of Tudela, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1770Born
1 Mar 181948.4SelectedBishop of Tudela, Spain
29 Mar 181948.5ConfirmedBishop of Tudela, Spain
4 Jul 181948.8Ordained BishopBishop of Tudela, Spain
30 Jan 184473.3DiedBishop of Tudela, Spain

MicroData Summary for Ramón María de Azpeitia y Sáenz de Santamaria
Bishop Ramón María de Azpeitia y Sáenz de Santamaria (born , died ) Bishop of Tudela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTorrecilla de Cameros

  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,223
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 380
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 138, Number 745
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,819, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast