Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Talayero Royo, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Albarracin, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1775Born
26 Apr 182954.1SelectedBishop of Albarracin, Spain
18 May 182954.2ConfirmedBishop of Albarracin, Spain
9 Aug 182954.4Ordained BishopBishop of Albarracin, Spain
7 Dec 183964.8DiedBishop of Albarracin, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Talayero Royo
Bishop José Talayero Royo O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Albarracin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillarluengo

  • a bishop for 10.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,225
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 65
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 146, Number 794
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1829, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast