Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mariano Báguena y Varona

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Ancyra

Titular See: (Abbot/San Ilderonso)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1760BornPeralejos, Spain
30 Sep 183171.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ancyra
26 Feb 183271.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Ancyra
15 Jul 183777.2DiedTitular Archbishop of Ancyra

MicroData Summary for Mariano Báguena y Varona:
Archbishop Mariano Báguena y Varona (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Ancyra

  • a bishop for 5.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,527
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 74
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 148, Number 807

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013