Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joaquín Briz, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Segovia, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1778Born
182546.1AppointedMaster General of Order of Friars Preachers
183152.1ResignedMaster General of Order of Friars Preachers
25 Oct 183153.0SelectedBishop of Segovia, Spain
24 Feb 183253.3ConfirmedBishop of Segovia, Spain
3 Jun 183253.6Ordained BishopBishop of Segovia, Spain
23 Jan 183758.2DiedBishop of Segovia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Joaquín Briz (VIAF: 169699904)
Bishop Joaquín Briz O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Segovia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZaragoza, Archdiocese of Zaragoza

  • a bishop for 4.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,893
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 340
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 148, Number 810
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,832, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast