Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dámaso Egidio Iglesias y Lago

Deceased

Bishop of Orense


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1768BornRedondela
21 Dec 181850.3AppointedBishop of Orense, Spain
19 Mar 181950.5Ordained BishopBishop of Orense, Spain
13 Nov 184072.2DiedBishop of Orense, Spain

MicroData Summary for Dámaso Egidio Iglesias y Lago
Bishop Dámaso Egidio Iglesias y Lago (born , died ) Bishop of Orense

  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Number 9,706
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 97
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 137, Number 740
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1819, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 14 May 2016