Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Isiro-Niangara

Dioecesis Isirensis-Niangaraensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Julien Andavo Mbia, Bishop
  • Emile Aiti Waro Leru’a, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 23 March 1970
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Kisangani
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Congo, The Democratic Republic of
  • Square Kilometers: 60,000 (23,175 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Eveche, B.P. 320, Isiro, Haut-Congo, Rep. Democratique du Congo
  • Telephone: 810.001.662
  • Fax: 813.464.311

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Eastern Uélé {Uélé Orientale}
18 December 1911ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Uélé / Wellé Prefecture Apostolic of Eastern Uélé {Uélé Orientale} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Eastern Uélé {Uélé Orientale}
6 May 1924ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Eastern Uélé {Uélé Orientale} Vicariate Apostolic of Eastern Uélé {Uélé Orientale}
Vicariate Apostolic of Niangara
14 December 1926Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Eastern Uélé {Uélé Orientale} Vicariate Apostolic of Niangara
24 February 1958Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Niangara Prefecture Apostolic of Doruma (erected)
Diocese of Niangara
10 November 1959ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Niangara Diocese of Niangara
Diocese of Isiro-Niangara
23 March 1970Name ChangedDiocese of Niangara Diocese of Isiro-Niangara

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Niangara
195090,220562,18216.0%558631,432777ap1951
Diocese of Niangara
Diocese of Isiro-Niangara
1970183,486445,92341.1%1445593,109609217ap1971
1980300,070514,76458.3%1353664,5466512219ap1981
1990407,863723,00056.4%3642785,2296313320ap1991
1999526,197728,11972.3%5742995,3154816119ap2000
2000500,482696,29271.9%76301064,7213715519ap2001
2001518,875705,23373.6%77311084,8044217519ap2002
2002720,880902,80279.8%6127888,1913517320ap2003
2003525,102830,33363.2%6229915,7703816419ap2004
2004997,6201,415,73070.5%68319910,0764618521ap2005
20061,038,7781,475,12870.4%64319510,9345217420ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.1, 5 Sep 2012; data: 7 Oct 2012