Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julien Andavo Mbia

Bishop of Isiro-Niangara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Sep 1950 BornFaradje
26 Aug 197929.0Ordained PriestPriest of Isiro-Niangara, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
1 Feb 200352.4AppointedBishop of Isiro-Niangara, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
19 Mar 200352.5Ordained BishopBishop of Isiro-Niangara, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Julien Andavo Mbia:
Bishop Julien Andavo Mbia (born ) Bishop of Isiro-Niangara

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Isiro-Niangara.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 170, Number 14,353
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 171, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013