Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Teke Lysinge

Bishop Emeritus of Mamfe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1938 BornMuea
17 Apr 196627.3Ordained PriestPriest
9 Feb 199960.1AppointedBishop of Mamfe, Cameroon
21 Apr 199960.3Ordained BishopBishop of Mamfe, Cameroon
25 Jan 201475.1RetiredBishop of Mamfe, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for Francis Teke Lysinge:
Bishop Francis Teke Lysinge (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Mamfe

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mamfe.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Number 13,503
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Number 13,545
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Jan 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 25 Jan 2014