Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Luis Astigarraga Lizarralde, C.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Yurimaguas, Peru

Titular Bishop of Buleliana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1940Born
1 Feb 196423.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Passion
26 Nov 199151.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Yurimaguas, Peru
26 Nov 199151.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Buleliana
29 Feb 199251.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Buleliana
17 Dec 201676.6RetiredVicar Apostolic of Yurimaguas, Peru
20 Jan 201776.7DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Yurimaguas, Peru

MicroData Summary for José Luis Astigarraga Lizarralde
Bishop José Luis Astigarraga Lizarralde C.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Yurimaguas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAzcoitia, Spain

  • a priest for 52.9 years
  • a bishop for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,658
  • r: Bollettino, 17 Dec 2016
  • d: CB, 20 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Jan 2017