Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Venancio Celestino Orbe Uriarte, C.P. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Moyobamba, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Apr 1927Born
7 Aug 194922.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Passion
25 Aug 196740.3AppointedPrelate of Moyobamba, Peru
25 Aug 196740.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Naratcata
21 Nov 196740.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Naratcata
1 Dec 197750.6ResignedTitular Bishop of Naratcata
6 Jun 200073.1ResignedPrelate of Moyobamba, Peru
18 Jul 200881.2DiedPrelate Emeritus of Moyobamba, Peru

MicroData Summary for Venancio Celestino Orbe Uriarte
Bishop Venancio Celestino Orbe Uriarte C.P. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Moyobamba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFruniz, Spain

  • a priest for 58.9 years
  • a bishop for 40.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Jan 2017