Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kévork Assadourian, I.C.P.B.

Auxiliary Bishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Armenian)

Titular Bishop of Amida degli Armeni


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Apr 1961 BornKamichlie, Syria
3 Oct 198625.4Ordained PriestPriest of Institut du Clergé Patriarcal de Bzommar
5 Sep 201554.3ConfirmedAuxiliary Bishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Armenian), Lebanon
5 Sep 201554.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Amida degli Armeni
21 Nov 201554.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amida degli Armeni

MicroData Summary for Kévork Assadourian:
Bishop Kévork Assadourian I.C.P.B. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Beirut {Bairut}

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Beirut {Bairut} (Armenian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Sep 2015
  • ob: CB, 12 Sep 2015
  • c2: CB, 10 Nov 2015
  • c3+: CB, 21 Nov 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 23 Nov 2015