Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pablo León Hakimian

Bishop of San Gregorio de Narek en Buenos Aires (Armenian), Argentina

Apostolic Exarch of America Latina e Messico {Latin America and Mexico} (Armenian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1953 Born
1980²26.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of San Gregorio de Narek en Buenos Aires (Armenian), Argentina
14 Aug 198127.7Ordained PriestPriest of San Gregorio de Narek en Buenos Aires (Armenian), Argentina
4 Jul 201864.6AppointedBishop of San Gregorio de Narek en Buenos Aires (Armenian), Argentina
4 Jul 201864.6AppointedApostolic Exarch of America Latina e Messico {Latin America and Mexico} (Armenian)
29 Sep 201864.8Ordained BishopBishop of San Gregorio de Narek en Buenos Aires (Armenian), Argentina

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pablo León Hakimian
Bishop Pablo León Hakimian (born ) Bishop of San Gregorio de Narek en Buenos Aires

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCairo, Egypt
Ordained DeaconRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained PriestNuestra Señora de Narek, Cathedral, Buenos Aires, Eparchy of San Gregorio de Narek en Buenos Aires (Armenian)
Ordained BishopSan Nicola da Tolentino, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of San Gregorio de Narek en Buenos Aires (Armenian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Jul 2018
  • c1: CB, 4 Jul 2018
  • od/c0/loc: CB, 5 Jul 2018
  • ob/c2: CB, 18 Jul 2018
  • c34: CB, 9 Sep 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 30 Sep 2018

Quantcast