Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Kévork Khazoumian, I.C.P.B.

Coadjutor Archbishop Emeritus of Istanbul (Armenian), Turkey


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1935 Born
3 Jul 196025.3Ordained PriestPriest
200165.8AppointedPatriarchal Exarch of Jerusalem and Amman {Gerusalemme e Amman} (Armenian), Palestine
22 Jan 200266.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Marasc degli Armeni
7 Apr 200267.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Marasc degli Armeni
15 Mar 200671.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Istanbul (Armenian), Turkey
21 May 201479.1RetiredCoadjutor Archbishop of Istanbul (Armenian), Turkey

MicroData Summary for Kévork Khazoumian
Archbishop Kévork Khazoumian I.C.P.B. (born ) Coadjutor Archbishop Emeritus of Istanbul

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChiah, Lebanon

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archeparchy of Istanbul (Armenian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Mar 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 167, Number 14,164
  • r: Bollettino, 21 May 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 16 Aug 2018

Quantcast