Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Santiago de Zubiría y Manzanera

Deceased

Archbishop of Durango, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1834Born
22 Feb 185823.2Ordained PriestPriest of Durango, México
18 Mar 189560.3AppointedArchbishop of Durango, México
12 May 189560.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Durango, México
26 Jan 190974.1DiedArchbishop of Durango, México

MicroData Summary for Santiago de Zubiría y Manzanera
Archbishop Santiago de Zubiría y Manzanera (born , died ) Archbishop of Durango

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDurango, Diocese of Durango
Ordained BishopCathedral, Durango, Archdiocese of Durango

  • a priest for 50.9 years
  • a bishop for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 254
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,895, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast