Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Marcos Semeria

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Melo, Uruguay

Titular Bishop of Prusa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1855Born
18 Jan 188024.8Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jul 191964.2AppointedBishop of Melo, Uruguay
9 Nov 191964.6Ordained BishopBishop of Melo, Uruguay
9 Jun 192267.2ResignedBishop of Melo, Uruguay
9 Jun 192267.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Prusa
11 Oct 193479.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Melo, Uruguay

MicroData Summary for José Marcos Semeria
Bishop José Marcos Semeria (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Melo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTacuarembo

  • a priest for 54.7 years
  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1935
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1919, Number 68

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast