Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Arnoldo Aparicio y Quintanilla, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of San Vicente, El Salvador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Apr 1908Born
20 Feb 193728.8Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
22 Feb 194637.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Salvador, El Salvador
22 Feb 194637.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Aezani
29 Jun 194638.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aezani
27 Nov 194840.5AppointedBishop of San Vicente, El Salvador
6 Jun 198375.1RetiredBishop of San Vicente, El Salvador
7 Sep 199284.3DiedBishop Emeritus of San Vicente, El Salvador

MicroData Summary for Pedro Arnoldo Aparicio y Quintanilla
Bishop Pedro Arnoldo Aparicio y Quintanilla S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop of San Vicente

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChinameca

  • a priest for 55.5 years
  • a bishop for 46.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast